Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law (12/09/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded version of the House passed version is repeated here.)

Amends the Continuing Appropriations Resolution, 2007 (Public Law 109-289, division B) to extend through February 15, 2007, specified continuing appropriations for FY2007, including activities under the "Chemical Demilitarization Construction, Defense-Wide" account of the Department of Defense.

(Sec. 3) Makes funds available, as provided in appropriations Acts for FY2006, including activities under the Food Stamp Act of 1997, and authorizes continuing obligations, for entitlements and mandatory payments under such Acts which are due January 1, 2007, February 1, 2007, and March 1, 2007.

(Sec. 4) Authorizes the obligation of funds appropriated for International Space Station Cargo Crew Services/International Partnership Purchases and International Space Station/Multi-User System Support within the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA).

(Sec. 5) Holds to the current rate for operations any amounts made available for civilian personnel compensation and benefits in each federal department and agency that have been apportioned before November 17, 2006.

(Sec. 6) Continues appropriations under this joint resolution for federal departments and agencies and related activities at the lowest rate of the House-passed, Senate-passed or previous-year funding levels.

(Sec. 7) Directs the Secretary of Transportation to extend through February 15, 2007, the termination date of any aircraft insurance or reinsurance policy. Extends through such date the immunity of air carriers to liability for thrid party claims arising out of acts of terrorism.

Extends through February 15, 2007, the authority of the House Democracy Assistance Commission.

Continues in effect through February 15, 2007, specified National Park Service final winter use rules for the 2006-2007 season.

Authorizes the transfer to the Veterans Health Administration for medical services of up to $683.97 million of certain funds made available to the Department of Veterans Affairs.

Delays until February 16, 2007, the scheduled 2007 percentage adjustment in congressional pay provided for under the Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946.