Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/09/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/09/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/09/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/09/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/09/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/09/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/10/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/10/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/10/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/10/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/10/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/10/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/10/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/10/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/10/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/10/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/10/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/10/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/10/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/10/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/10/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/10/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/10/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/10/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/10/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/10/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/10/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/10/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/10/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/10/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/10/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/10/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/10/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/10/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/10/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/10/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/10/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/10/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/10/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/16/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/16/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/18/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/18/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/18/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/18/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/18/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/23/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/23/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/23/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/25/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/20/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/20/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/20/2005