Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/09/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/09/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/09/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/05/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/12/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/12/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/21/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/26/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/02/2006