Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/03/2005
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 03/03/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/03/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/03/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/03/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/03/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/03/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/03/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/03/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/03/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/03/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/03/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/03/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/03/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/03/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/14/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/14/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/17/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/05/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/05/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/05/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/13/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/13/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/13/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/27/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/27/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/24/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/06/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew