Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/28/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/28/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/03/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/12/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/16/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/23/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/25/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/07/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/21/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/20/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/20/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/21/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/27/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/27/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/28/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/07/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/17/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/18/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/18/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 11/03/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/07/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/15/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/17/2005