Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
03/20/2006 Became Public Law No: 109-182.
03/20/2006 Signed by President.
03/17/2006 Presented to President.
03/16/2006 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 48. Record Vote Number: 54.
03/15/2006 Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/02/2005 Introduced in House
04/28/2005 Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House pursuant to rule XXVII and H. Con. Res. 95