There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Approving the renewal of import restrictions contained in the Burmese Freedom and Democracy Act of 2003.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
07/27/2005Became Public Law No: 109-39. (TXT | PDF)
07/27/2005Signed by President.
07/22/2005Presented to President.
07/19/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 1. Record Vote Number: 191.
06/21/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 2 (Roll no. 291).(text: CR H4813)
05/26/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
07/27/2005Became Public Law No: 109-39. (TXT | PDF)
07/27/2005Signed by President.
07/22/2005HousePresented to President.
07/19/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/19/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 1. Record Vote Number: 191.
07/19/2005SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8440-8446)
06/22/2005SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 135. Pursuant to P.L. 108-61, section 9 (c)(2)(B), incorporating 19 U.S.C. 2192(f)(1)(A)(ii).
06/21/2005-4:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/21/2005-4:53pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 2 (Roll no. 291). (text: CR H4813)
06/21/2005-4:46pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4858-4859)
06/21/2005-11:11amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/21/2005-10:50amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 52.
06/21/2005-10:50amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4813-4817)
06/21/2005-10:49amHouseMr. Shaw moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
05/26/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
05/26/2005HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22]* 05/26/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/26/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/26/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/20/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/20/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/20/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/20/2005

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/26/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.J.Res.52. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-39 (07/27/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Approves the renewal of certain import restrictions contained in the Burmese Freedom and Democracy Act of 2003.