There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States to provide that Representatives shall be apportioned among the several States according to their respective numbers, counting the number of persons in each State who are citizens of the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/09/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/01/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/09/2005Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/09/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/14/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/14/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/14/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/14/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/15/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/15/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/15/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/16/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/16/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/20/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/20/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/20/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/20/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/21/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/21/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/21/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/21/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/21/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/22/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/22/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/27/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/28/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/28/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/28/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/12/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/01/2006
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/08/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/14/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/17/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/09/2005 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution07/01/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.53.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.53. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/09/2005)

Constitutional Amendment - Requires Representatives to be apportioned among the several States according to their respective numbers, which shall be determined by counting the number of persons in each State who are U.S. citizens.