Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/14/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/14/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/14/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/14/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/15/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/15/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/15/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/16/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/16/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/20/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/20/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/20/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/20/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/21/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/21/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/21/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/21/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/21/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/22/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/22/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/27/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/28/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/28/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/28/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/12/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/01/2006
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/08/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/14/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/17/2006