There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Withdrawal of United States Armed Forces From Iraq Resolution of 2005--Homeward Bound

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Requiring the President to develop and implement a plan for the withdrawal of United States Armed Forces from Iraq, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/16/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/16/2005Referred to the Committee on International Relations, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/16/2005Referred to the Committee on International Relations, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/16/2005Referred to the Committee on International Relations, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/16/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/17/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/17/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/17/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/17/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/17/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/17/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/17/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/21/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/21/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/21/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/21/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/29/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/29/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/29/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/13/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/13/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/13/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/26/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/26/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/27/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/27/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/27/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/27/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/28/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/28/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/28/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/28/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/29/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/29/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/07/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/07/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/07/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/07/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/07/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/07/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/07/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/15/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/15/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/22/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/28/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/07/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/19/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/06/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/09/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/09/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/21/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/21/2006

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations06/16/2005 Referred to
House Armed Services06/16/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.55. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/16/2005)

Withdrawal of United States Armed Forces From Iraq Resolution of 2005--Homeward Bound - Declares that it is U.S. policy to: (1) announce, not later than December 31, 2005, a plan for the withdrawal of all U.S. Armed Forces from Iraq; (2) turn over, at the earliest possible date, all military operations in Iraq to the elected government of Iraq and provide for the prompt and orderly withdrawal of all U.S. Armed Forces from Iraq; and (3) initiate such a withdrawal as soon as possible but not later than October 1, 2006.

Requires the President to implement that policy by: (1) taking steps to ensure the completion of Iraq's political transition to a constitutionally elected government by December 31, 2005; (2) establishing a plan for the withdrawal of all U.S. Armed Forces from Iraq limited only by steps to ensure the safety of such forces; (3) establishing a plan for a transition of responsibility for internal security activities to the military forces of the Iraqi government and a transition of U.S. military personnel to an advisory and support role; (4) accelerating the training and equipping of the military and security forces of the Iraqi government; and (5) accounting for any missing members of the U.S. Armed Forces or U.S. citizens in Iraq prior to completion of the withdrawal.