Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/17/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/17/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/17/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/17/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/17/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/17/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/17/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/21/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/21/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/21/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/21/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/29/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/29/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/29/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/13/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/13/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/13/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/26/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/26/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/27/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/27/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/27/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/27/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/28/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/28/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/28/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/28/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/29/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/29/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/07/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/07/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/07/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/07/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/07/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/07/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/07/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/15/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/15/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/22/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/28/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/07/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/19/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/06/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/09/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/09/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/21/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/21/2006