There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Proposing a balanced budget amendment the Constitution of the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/13/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
08/23/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/13/2005Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/13/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (143)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 07/13/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/13/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 07/13/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 07/13/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/13/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 07/13/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/14/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/19/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/13/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/23/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/23/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/23/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/23/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/23/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/23/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/06/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/14/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/22/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/19/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/19/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/13/2005 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution08/23/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (15)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.58. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/13/2005)

Constitutional Amendment - Prohibits outlays for a fiscal year (except those for repayment of debt principal) from exceeding total receipts for that fiscal year (except those derived from borrowing) unless Congress, by a three-fifths rollcall vote of each House, authorizes a specific excess of outlays over receipts.

Requires a three-fifths rollcall vote of each House to increase the public debt limit.

Directs the President to submit a balanced budget to Congress annually.

Prohibits any bill to increase revenue from becoming law unless approved by a majority of each House by rollcall vote.

Authorizes waivers of these provisions when a declaration of war is in effect or under other specified circumstances involving military conflict.