Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/14/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/13/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/23/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/23/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/25/2006