Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/01/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/08/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/08/2006
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/08/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/14/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 02/14/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 02/28/2006