Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/03/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/03/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/03/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/03/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 11/14/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/14/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/15/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/15/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/15/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/17/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/07/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/07/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/07/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/15/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/15/2005