Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/17/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 12/17/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 12/17/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 12/18/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/01/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/08/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 02/08/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 02/15/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/15/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/15/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/15/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/15/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/16/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/30/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/30/2006