There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Popular Titles

Continuing Appropriations resolution FY2006 (Second) (Identified by CRS)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making further continuing appropriations for the fiscal year 2006, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
11/19/2005Became Public Law No: 109-105. (TXT | PDF)
11/19/2005Signed by President.
11/18/2005Presented to President.
11/18/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
11/17/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 413 - 16 (Roll no. 599).(text: CR H10517)
11/16/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/19/2005Became Public Law No: 109-105. (TXT | PDF)
11/19/2005Signed by President.
11/18/2005HousePresented to President.
11/18/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/18/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
11/18/2005SenateS.Amdt.2672 Amendment SA 2672 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 50. Record Vote Number: 348.
11/18/2005SenateS.Amdt.2672 Amendment SA 2672 proposed by Senator Harkin. (consideration: CR S13285-13287; text: CR S13285) To increase the amount appropriated to carry out under the Community Services Block Grant Act.
11/18/2005SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S13283-13287)
11/17/2005SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
11/17/2005-2:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/17/2005-2:26pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 413 - 16 (Roll no. 599). (text: CR H10517)
11/17/2005-2:13pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10530-10531)
11/17/2005-12:25pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair put the question on adoption of the joint resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Lewis (CA) demanded the yeas and nays. The Chair announced that the yeas and nays were ordered and subsequently postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the joint resolution until later in the legislative day.
11/17/2005-12:24pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H10517)
11/17/2005-12:15pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 72.
11/17/2005-12:15pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 72 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Sec. 2. House Resolution 542 is laid on the table. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
11/17/2005-12:15pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 558. (consideration: CR H10517-10518)
11/17/2005-11:51amHouseRule H. Res. 558 passed House.
11/17/2005-8:20amHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 558 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 72 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Sec. 2. House Resolution 542 is laid on the table. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
11/16/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
11/16/2005HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Appropriations11/16/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.J.Res.72. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-105 (11/19/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends Public Law 109-77 to extend until December 17, 2005, specified continuing appropriations for FY2006.