Summary: H.J.Res.75 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-128 (12/18/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on December 17, 2005. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends Public Law 109-77 to extend until December 31, 2006, specified continuing appropriations for FY2006.

Declares that, notwithstanding such date, funds shall be available and obligations for mandatory payments due on or about November 1, 2005, December 1, 2005, and January 1, 2006.