Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/16/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/28/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/09/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/30/2006