Refine your search

6 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
08/01/2006 Became Public Law No: 109-251.
08/01/2006 Signed by President.
07/27/2006 Presented to President.
07/26/2006 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
07/11/2006 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5010)
05/19/2006 Introduced in House