Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/06/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 06/06/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/06/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 06/06/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/06/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/07/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/07/2006
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/09/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/09/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/09/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/13/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/13/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/13/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/13/2006
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/13/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/13/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/13/2006
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/13/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/13/2006
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/15/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/22/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/22/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/29/2006
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/29/2006
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/29/2006
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/10/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/12/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/17/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/17/2006
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/17/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/17/2006