There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Disapproving the granting of amnesty by the Government of Iraq to persons known to have attacked, kidnapped, wounded, or killed members of the Armed Forces of the United States or citizens of the United States in Iraq.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/22/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/10/2006Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4941, H4942, H4943)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/22/2006Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/22/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 06/22/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/22/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/22/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/26/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/26/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/26/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/26/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/26/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/27/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/27/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/29/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/29/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/12/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/12/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/12/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/17/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/18/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/19/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations06/22/2006 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.90.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.90. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/22/2006)

Declares that it is U.S. policy to oppose any effort by the Iraqi government to grant amnesty to anyone known to have attacked, kidnapped, wounded, or killed members of the U.S. Armed Forces or U.S. citizens. Calls for the President to notify the Iraqi government of such opposition.