Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 06/22/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/22/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/22/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/26/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/26/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/26/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/26/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/26/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/27/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/27/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/29/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/29/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/12/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/12/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/12/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/17/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/18/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/19/2006