Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/16/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/17/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/17/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/17/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/17/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/01/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/01/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/01/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/01/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/01/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/01/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/01/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/02/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/02/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/02/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/02/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/02/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/02/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/02/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/02/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/02/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/02/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/03/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 03/03/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/03/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/03/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/03/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/03/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/03/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/08/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/08/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/08/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/08/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/08/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/08/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/09/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/09/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/09/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/09/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/09/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/09/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/10/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/10/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/14/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/14/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/14/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/14/2005