Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/29/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 09/29/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 09/29/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 09/29/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 09/29/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/29/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 09/29/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 09/29/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/29/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 09/29/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 09/29/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 09/29/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/29/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 09/29/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/29/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 09/29/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/13/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 11/13/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/13/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/13/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/13/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/13/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/13/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/14/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/14/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/14/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/14/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/14/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 11/14/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/14/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/14/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/14/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/15/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/05/2006