Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/16/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/01/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/01/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/01/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/01/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/01/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/10/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/14/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/14/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/19/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/19/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/19/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/26/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 04/26/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/12/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/14/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/14/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/15/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/01/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/08/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/15/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/15/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/16/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/16/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/27/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/27/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/27/2006