Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/05/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/12/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/18/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/19/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/19/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/19/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/19/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/19/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/07/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/08/2005