Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/01/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/09/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/09/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/09/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/09/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/09/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/09/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/09/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/17/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/06/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/06/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/06/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/06/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/06/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/06/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/06/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/06/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/06/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/06/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/06/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/06/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/06/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/06/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/06/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/06/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/06/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/06/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/15/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/15/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/15/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/15/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/15/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/28/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/28/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/03/2006