Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/08/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/08/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/08/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/08/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/08/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/08/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/08/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/08/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/08/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/08/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/08/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 03/08/2005
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 03/08/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/08/2005
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/08/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/08/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/08/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/09/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/10/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 03/10/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/10/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/10/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/10/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/10/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/10/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/10/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/10/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/14/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/14/2005
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22] 03/14/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/14/2005