Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/10/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/10/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/17/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/17/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/17/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/13/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/13/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/14/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/14/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/14/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/21/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/21/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/22/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/22/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/22/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/22/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/22/2005
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 09/22/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/29/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/29/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 10/20/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/20/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/20/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/20/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 03/29/2006