There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting the goals and ideals of a "Rotary International Day" and celebrating and honoring Rotary International on the occasion of its centennial anniversary.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/10/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 0 (Roll no. 163).(text: CR H3071)
03/08/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
05/10/2005-7:08pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/10/2005-7:08pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 0 (Roll no. 163). (text: CR H3071)
05/10/2005-6:49pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3085-3086)
05/10/2005-3:13pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/10/2005-2:56pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 142.
05/10/2005-2:56pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3071-3075)
05/10/2005-2:56pmMs. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
03/16/2005Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
03/16/2005Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/08/2005Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
03/08/2005Introduced in House

Cosponsors (74)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/16/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/16/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/16/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/06/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/12/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/19/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/10/2005

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform03/08/2005 Referred to
03/16/2005 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.142. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/10/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Expresses support for the goals and ideals of Rotary International Day (February 23, 2005) to celebrate the 100th anniversary of Rotary International. Recognizes Rotary International's service to improving the human condition in communities throughout the world.