Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/16/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/16/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/16/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/06/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/12/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/19/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/10/2005