Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/15/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/15/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/15/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/15/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/15/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/15/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/15/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/15/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/15/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/15/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/15/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/15/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/15/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/15/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/15/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 03/15/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/15/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 03/15/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/15/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 03/15/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/15/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/15/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/15/2005
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/15/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/15/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/15/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/15/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/15/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/15/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/15/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/15/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/15/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/15/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/15/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/15/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/15/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/15/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/15/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/15/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/15/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/15/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/15/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/15/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/15/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/15/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/15/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/15/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/16/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/16/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/16/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/17/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/06/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/06/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/06/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/06/2005