Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/16/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/16/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/16/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/16/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/16/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/16/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/16/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/16/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/16/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/17/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/17/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/14/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/14/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/14/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/21/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/21/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/21/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/21/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 07/21/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/28/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/28/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/29/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/06/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/06/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/06/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/13/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/13/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/13/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/13/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/13/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/13/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/14/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/14/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/14/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/14/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/14/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/14/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/14/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 09/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/14/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/14/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 09/20/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/20/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/20/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/20/2005