Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/17/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/06/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/06/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/06/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/06/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/06/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/06/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/06/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/06/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/19/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/20/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/26/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/04/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/19/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/23/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/19/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/13/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/06/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/16/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 04/26/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/26/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/26/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/26/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/26/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/09/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/09/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/09/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/28/2006