Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/16/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/26/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/26/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/05/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/05/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 05/05/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/05/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/19/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/19/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/26/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/26/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/26/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/26/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/26/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/26/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/26/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/26/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/26/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/26/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/26/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/26/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/26/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/26/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/26/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/26/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/26/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/26/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/26/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/26/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/26/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/26/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/26/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/26/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/26/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/26/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/16/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/16/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/16/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/16/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/16/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/16/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/16/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/16/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/16/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/16/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/20/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/22/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/07/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/10/2005