Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/12/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/04/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/15/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/29/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/20/2005