Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 04/05/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/06/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/08/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/12/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/13/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/19/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/19/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/19/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/19/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/19/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/19/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/19/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/19/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/19/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/20/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/20/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/20/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/16/2005