Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/06/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/06/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/06/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/06/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/06/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/06/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/06/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/06/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/06/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/06/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/06/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/06/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/06/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/06/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/06/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/06/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/06/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/06/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/06/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/06/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/06/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/06/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/06/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/06/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/06/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/06/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/06/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/06/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/06/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/06/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/06/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/06/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/06/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/06/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/06/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/06/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/06/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/06/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/06/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/06/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/06/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/06/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/06/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/06/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/06/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/06/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/06/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/06/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/06/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/06/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/06/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/06/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/12/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/12/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/12/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/14/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/27/2005