Text: H.Res.193 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Engrossed in House (05/10/2005)

 
[Congressional Bills 109th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H. Res. 193 Engrossed in House (EH)]


                 In the House of Representatives, U.S.,

                                                          May 10, 2005.
Whereas Fidel Castro's terrorist regime has continued to repress all attempts by 
        the Cuban people to bring democratic change to Cuba and denies 
        universally recognized liberties, including freedom of speech, 
        association, movement, and the press;
Whereas thousands of political prisoners are currently imprisoned by Fidel 
        Castro's totalitarian regime;
Whereas in March 2003 Fidel Castro carried out a massive, island wide crackdown 
        on members of Cuba's pro-democracy movement, under which pro-democracy 
        activists were arrested, subjected to ``summary trials'', and sentenced 
        to up to 28 years in prison for their pro-democracy activities;
Whereas the Department of State's 2004 Country Reports on Human Rights 
        Practices, in referring to Castro's Cuba, states: ``Members of the 
        security forces and prison officials continued to beat and abuse 
        detainees and prisoners, including human rights activists. . . . Prison 
        conditions remained harsh and life threatening, and the Government 
        restricted medical care to some prisoners as a method of control. 
        Prisoners died in jail due to lack of medical care.'';
Whereas on May 20, 1902, the Republic of Cuba obtained its independence;
Whereas in the spirit of Jose Marti, many of the future leaders of a free Cuba 
        have called for a meeting of the Assembly of the Civil Society in Cuba, 
        an organization that consists of over 360 opposition and civil society 
        organizations in Cuba;
Whereas on May 20, 2005, the Assembly to Promote the Civil Society in Cuba seeks 
        to convene an historic meeting in Havana on the 103rd anniversary of 
        Cuban Independence;
Whereas the Assembly to Promote the Civil Society in Cuba will focus on bringing 
        democracy and liberty to the enslaved island of Cuba;
Whereas the Assembly to Promote the Civil Society in Cuba is led by three 
        courageous pro-democracy opponents of the Castro regime--Martha Beatriz 
        Roque Cabello, Felix Bonne Carcasses, and Rene Gomez Manzano;
Whereas organizers and participants are convening a meeting of the Assembly to 
        Promote the Civil Society in Cuba at great risk to themselves and their 
        families; and
Whereas President George W. Bush stated in his second inaugural address on 
        January 20, 2005: ``All who live in tyranny and hopelessness can know: 
        the United States will not ignore your oppression, or excuse your 
        oppressors. When you stand for your liberty, we will stand with you. 
        Democratic reformers facing repression, prison, or exile can know: 
        America sees you for who you are--the future leaders of your free 
        country.'': Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved,  That the House of Representatives--
            (1) extends its support and solidarity to the organizers and 
        participants of the historic meeting of the Assembly to Promote the 
        Civil Society in Cuba on May 20, 2005, in Havana;
            (2) urges the international community to support the Assembly's 
        mission to bring democracy to Cuba;
            (3) urges the Administration and international community to actively 
        oppose any attempts by the Castro regime to repress or punish the 
        organizers and participants of the Assembly; and
            (4) shares the pro-democracy ideals of the Assembly to Promote the 
        Civil Society in Cuba and believes that this Assembly and others will 
        hasten the day of freedom and democracy for the people of Cuba.
            Attest:

                                                                          Clerk.

Share This