Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/06/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/06/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/18/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/18/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/18/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/18/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/18/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 04/18/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/26/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/26/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/26/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/26/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/26/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/26/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/26/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/27/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/27/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/02/2005