Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/11/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/11/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/11/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/11/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/11/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/24/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/24/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/24/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/24/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/24/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/24/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/24/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/25/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/25/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/25/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/25/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/25/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/25/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/25/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/26/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/26/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/26/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/26/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/26/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/26/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/07/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/07/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/07/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/09/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/09/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/14/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/22/2005