Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/26/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/26/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/26/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/26/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/28/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/28/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/28/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/12/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 05/12/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/12/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/12/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/18/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/18/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/08/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/08/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/16/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/28/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/15/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/15/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/18/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 10/18/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/20/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 11/02/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/02/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 11/02/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 11/03/2005