Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/26/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/26/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/26/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/26/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/26/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/28/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/28/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/11/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/11/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/11/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/11/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/11/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/11/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/17/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/17/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/17/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/25/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/25/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/25/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/09/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/09/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/09/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/09/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/09/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/09/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/16/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/16/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/16/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/24/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/24/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/24/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/24/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/24/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/24/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/29/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/29/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/29/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 07/13/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/13/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/13/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/13/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/13/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/13/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/13/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/13/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/13/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/20/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/20/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/28/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/15/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/15/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/15/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/28/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/28/2005