Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/27/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/27/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 04/27/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/28/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/28/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/28/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/28/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/28/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/28/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/28/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/03/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/03/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/03/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/03/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/03/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/03/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/03/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/03/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/04/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/04/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 05/09/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/09/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/09/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/09/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/09/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/09/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/09/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/09/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/09/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/09/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/10/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/10/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/10/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/10/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/12/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/12/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/24/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/25/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/02/2006