Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/05/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/16/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/25/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/14/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/22/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/23/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/26/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/26/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/27/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/07/2005