Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/28/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/28/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/04/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/04/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/04/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/04/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/04/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/04/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/04/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/04/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/10/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/10/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/10/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/10/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/10/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/10/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/10/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/11/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/19/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/19/2005