Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/04/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/18/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/18/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/18/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/18/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/18/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/18/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/18/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/18/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/18/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/18/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/18/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/18/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/26/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/26/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 05/26/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/26/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/26/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/26/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/09/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/09/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/09/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/09/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/09/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/09/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/09/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/09/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/09/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/09/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/09/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/09/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/09/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/23/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/23/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/30/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/06/2005