Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 05/10/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/10/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 05/11/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/11/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/11/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/11/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/11/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/11/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/11/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/11/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/11/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/11/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/11/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/11/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/11/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/11/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/11/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/11/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/11/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/11/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/11/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/11/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/11/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/11/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/11/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/11/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/12/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/12/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/12/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/12/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/16/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/16/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/16/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/16/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/16/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/16/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/16/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/16/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 05/16/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/16/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/16/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 05/16/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/16/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/16/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/16/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/16/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/16/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/16/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/16/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/16/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/16/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/16/2005