Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/23/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/23/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/23/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/25/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/25/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/25/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/25/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/25/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/25/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 06/15/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/15/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/15/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/15/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 06/15/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/15/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/15/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/15/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/15/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/28/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/28/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/28/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/13/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/13/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/13/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/28/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/07/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/07/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/07/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/07/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/07/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/13/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/15/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/15/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/15/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/22/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/29/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 09/29/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/29/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/06/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/06/2005